Glenn J Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February His name was Johann Franz. in any case I have long lost any faith in the accuracy of the information in Wolf‘s table of officers. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
GreyC Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February 2 minutes ago, Glenn J said: His name was Johann Franz Hi Glenn I got that. That´s why I was wondering about what his first name was (not always the one up front) and why the person in the company with Prigge was called Hans. It ight be short for Johannes which would point to Johannes as first name or could be a different person. GreyC Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February Hi Grey, understood. I am happy that Johann and Hans Brimberg of the firm Prigge Brimberg are the same guy. He is named as Johann in connection with his former activity at Prigge Brimberg in the periodical “Bauwirtschaft”. What I cannot do is confirm the connection to the GFR Zahlmeisteraspirant or definitively that he was the military mission Zahlmeister despite the connections and coincidences. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February 19 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Breuer Carl ObLtzS to KaptzS (Ing) Marine Marine-Oberstabsingenieur (14.7.14) Carl Breuer, born 27 December 1866 was the chief engineer on the Goeben until May 1915 when he assumed responsibility for the entire Mittelmeerdivision. In October 1917 he was assigned to the staff of the North Sea naval station. He ended the war as an instructor and the deck officer and engineer school, retiring on 24 November 1919. Charakter as a Fregattenkapitän (Ing.) on 18 December 1919. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
GreyC Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February Understood GreyC Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 20 February Share Posted 20 February 21 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Brinkmann (Brinckman) Franz ObLtzS Marine Steve, Oberleutnant zur See Franz Brinckmann, born 25 February 1893 at Harburg. Crew of 1911. SMS Breslau on outbreak of war as a Leutnant zur See (3.8.14). Adjutant of the Haireddin Barbarossa from August 1914 to August 1915. U boat half-flotilla until November 1915. Various postings to the Torgut Reis and the Euphrates River detachment. Back to Germany in September 1918 with I. seaman division. Retired 6 November 1919. Holder of the Iron Cross 1st Class, Mecklenburg Military Merit Cross 1st Class, Turkish silver medal and Iron Crescent. Returned to service in WW2 rising to Korvettenkapitän der Reserve. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
stevenbecker Posted 20 February Author Share Posted 20 February Yes, I notice that the register showns Erich Prigge. Hans Brimberg My understanding is Hans was short for Johann Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
stevenbecker Posted 22 February Author Share Posted 22 February (edited) Cheers mates, Todays; Bronner Rudolf LtzS (Ing) Marine Ingenieur (Engineer Officer) SMS Breslau (Midilli) 1916- (not identified)? shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Brümmer-Städt Bruno LtzS (Ing) Marine Ingenieur (Engineer Officer) SMS Breslau (Midilli) 1915- (not identified)? shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Brüning (gen. Brinkmann) Fritz Maj Prof Dr Deutsche Militär-Mission in der Türkei - Prof Oberstabsarzt Medical lecturer in Gülhane 1916-17 (not identified)? shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Sorry, I thought we did this bloke, but it appears not Brodosotti Hermann Maj Eisenbahn Field Railway Inspectorate Istanbul 1915-16 (born 1868 at Löwenberg died?) RTG 1916 illness lung catarrh (not identified)? shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Wolf shows he was comm 1-4-1889, so he must be either a Reservist or a.D. or something like that? Edited 22 February by stevenbecker Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 10 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Brodosotti Hermann Bit of a mess, this one. Major Hermann Stettmund von Brodorotti, born 9 August 1868 at Löwenberg in Silesia. Commissioned into Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 95 on 21.9.89. By the publication of 1914 Prussian Rangliste in May 1914, he had risen to the rank of Major ((18.12.13) and was on the staff 2. Garde-Regiment zu Fuß. At mobilisation he assumed command of II./Reserve-Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 64 which he led until 16 February 1915. He was commanding Landwehr-Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 30 after his return from the Ottoman theatre. Retired with the Charakter of Oberstleutnant on 20 October 1919. He died in 1933. 10 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Wolf shows he was comm 1-4-1889, so he must be either a Reservist or a.D. or something like that? He was certainly not old for his rank. Promotion in the Prussian army in peacetime was glacial (not much better during the war!) and it would be a lucky individual who reached the rank of captain before his mid thirties. He was promoted to Hauptmann in 1904 so 35-36 years old at the time. It was then normal to hold that rank for nine or ten years before promotion to major. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 16 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Brüning (gen. Brinkmann) Fritz Maj Prof Dr Steve, Stabsarzt (22.5.12) Dr. Friedrich Brüning, born 21 March 1879 at Neumünster. Originally a reserve medical officer, he entered active service in the Prussian army on 27 January 1909 in Feldartillerie-Regiment Nr. 30. He was serving at the Kaiser Wilhelms Academy in 1914 and at mobilisation was assigned to Feldlazarett 4 of the I. Armee-Korps. He was assigned to the military mission on 17 March 1915 as an instructor at the military medical institution in Constantinople moving to the position of embassy surgeon there on 6 July 1918. He remained briefly in the post war army being promoted to Oberstabsarzt on 16.7.20. He left the army on 30 June 1921 and became a professor of surgery at the university of Berlin. Died 4 November 1938. Not sure about the gen. Brinkmann??? Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 17 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Bronner Rudolf LtzS (Ing) Marine Ingenieur (Engineer Officer) SMS Breslau (Midilli) Marine-Ingenieur der Reserve (13.5.16) Rudolf Bronner, born 25 March 1882. Initially on SMS Berlin until March 1915 when placed at the disposal of the 1. Dockyard Division. July 1915 assigned to SMS Zähringen until February 1916 when transferred still in the rank of a Marine-Ingenieuraspirant der Reserve to SMS Breslau as a watch engineer. Demobilised/retired December 1916. Presumably illness? Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 17 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Brümmer-Städt Bruno LtzS (Ing) Marine Ingenieur (Engineer Officer) SMS Breslau (Midilli) Marine-Ingenieuraspirant Bruno Brümmerstädt (all one word!), born 16 November 1892 in Berlin. Initially on SMS Hessen until assigned to the Breslau in March 1915, presumably still in the rank of a Marine-Ingenieurapplikant (Maat) or Marineingenieuroberapplikant (Obermaat). He left in October of that year to attend the engineer and deck officer school, being promoted to Marine-Ingenieuraspirant 10 December 1917 having been assigned to the U boat school the previous September (1917). Left the navy on 30 November 1919 and awarded the Charakter of a Leutnant (Ing.) on 21 February 1920. As will be seen from above, he would at most have held the rank of a senior petty officer on the Breslau. Luftwaffe Major in WW2. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
GreyC Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 2 hours ago, Glenn J said: Not sure about the gen. Brinkmann??? Usually an indication of being born out of wedlock (genannt Brinkmann = named Brinkmann = the surname of the other parent) GreyC Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
stevenbecker Posted 22 February Author Share Posted 22 February Thanks guys, You lean something every day here on this site. Glenn the rank structure is stuffed up either by Wolf or who ever translated, thats why I get mixed up. Todays Brünn W. Maj Dr Deutsche Militär-Mission in der Türkei - Oberstabsarzt Medical Bacteriologist in a Laboratory 1915-17 (not identified)? shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Buhlan Willy Capt / Hptm Sdr-Kdo (Sonderkommando) Naval Shore Dett to OzbV Adjt of Adm von Usedom 1916-18 (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Bultmann Johannes Lt Sdr-Kdo (Sonderkommando Usedom) Artillery officer - Coastal Artillery 1914-18 (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 22 February Share Posted 22 February 35 minutes ago, GreyC said: Usually an indication of being born out of wedlock (genannt Brinkmann = named Brinkmann = the surname of the other parent) GreyC Indeed it is; Apologies for not making myself very clear. My point was is that there is no indication that Dr. Brüning was so named. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February 20 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Brünn W. Maj Dr Deutsche Militär-Mission in der Türkei Steve, Bavarian Stabsarzt Dr. Wilhelm Brünn, born in Straubing on 20 April 1876. Commissioned as an Assistenzarzt on 25.7.01 , he spent most of his pre-war career as a medical officer with the Schutztruppe in German East Africa, being assigned there on 20 March 1903. He only returned to Germany in August 1914 and was assigned to the 3. Infanterie-Regiment although at mobilisation was assigned to the Ersatz-Feldartillerie-Regiment. He also served with the 4. Feldartillerie-Regiment and the 7. Feldartillerie-Regiment. Promoted to Oberstabsarzt on 26.10.17. He retired on 11 July 1919. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February 21 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Buhlan Willy Capt / Hptm Sdr-Kdo (Sonderkommando) Hauptmann der Reserve der Marine-Infanterie Willy Buhlan, born 7 July 1876. Initially served as a company commander in the I. See-Bataillon/1. Marine-Infanterie-Regiment and was assigned to the Sonderkommando in June 1916. Served as Admiral von Usedom's adjutant until the war's end. Demobilised 25 November 1918. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February 21 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Bultmann Johannes Lt Sdr-Kdo (Sonderkommando Usedom) Artillery officer - Coastal Artillery 1914-18 Vizefeuerwerker der Reserve Adolf Johannes Bultmann (Landwehr-Bezirk II Bremen), born 23 April 1887 in Oldenburg. With the Sonderkommando for pretty much the entire war. Only commissioned on 18.1.18. Demobilised 21 January 1920. Died 5 February 1978. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
GreyC Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February 44 minutes ago, Glenn J said: Bavarian Stabsarzt Dr. Wilhelm Brünn, born in Straubing on 20 April 1876 So this could be his doctoral dissertation: Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February 57 minutes ago, GreyC said: So this could be his doctoral dissertation: Hi Grey, seems very likely, his full name was Friedrich Wilhelm Brünn. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
stevenbecker Posted 23 February Author Share Posted 23 February (edited) Thank you Todays Burchardi (Buchardi) Theodor LtCol (Col) Dr Deutsche Militär-Mission in der Türkei - shown QMG 5th Army at Gallipoli 1915 - Savas Bak. Levazim dairesinde görevli 1st Ordu Levazim islerinde (In the 1st Army Levazim Works in the Levazim Circle) Savas Bak. 1. Army supplies in charge of the 55. Huttner Pharmacist Inspector 1 and 5.Ordu Pharmacist Officer (Apotheker) 1913-18 (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Bürklein (Bürklen) Reinhold FähnrichzS Marine Fähnrich (officer candidate) SMS Goeben (Yavuz) 1918- (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Christoph (or see Kümmerling) Wachtmeister Offiziersstellvertreter (Deputy officer) Sdr-Kdo (Sonderkommando Usedom) or see Kümmerling 1915-16 awarded Ottoman Silver Liakat Medal 12-10-15 not confirmed? (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Names from Wolf and other sources, seam to not a line, maybe you will have better luck finding them with what spellings I found. Christoph maybe the same as Kummerling, but I could not confirm? PS I did notice this man, an wondered if he is the same as Buchardi or his son went with him, as many high officers seam to do, or they made a mistake with the rank showned Lt when it should be LtCol? Burchardi Theodor Lt Askeri komiser 1914 (Military commissioner (1914) 1913-14 (not identified)? Edited 23 February by stevenbecker Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Michael Lowrey Posted 23 February Share Posted 23 February Reinhold Bürklen, born April 23, 1898, entered the navy in October 1916, Fähnrich zur See (=officer candidate), on Goeben from May 1918. December 1918 transferred to the reserves in December 1918, promoted to Leutnant zur See der Reserve September 28, 1919, out of naval service on January 21, 1920 as a Leutnant zur See. He's an Ergängungsoffizier of the Kriegmarine, with the rank of Kapitänleutnat (October 1, 1934), Korvettenkapitän (October 1, 1938) and then a regular Fregattenkapitän (August 1, 1942). Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 24 February Share Posted 24 February 19 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Burchardi (Buchardi) Theodor Militär-Intendanturrat (17.8.07) Heinrich Paul Theodor Burchardi, born 17 July 1872 in Berlin . Herr Burchardi was a senior official in the intendance branch of the Prussian military administration with the broad equivalence to the rank of a major (hence his elevation to the rank of Ottoman lieutenant-colonel). He was also a Hauptmann der Reserve in Infanterie-Regiment Nr. 25. Joined the Prussian military administration in 1889 and was one of the original members of the military mission of 1913 and is to be seen in the well known photo with Liman, Bronsart and Weber etc. Successively Intendant (commander logistics) of 1st and 5th armies and later of the mission in Constantinople. Following the war a senior civil servant (Oberregierungsrat) dealing with support and welfare matters. He was still alive and employed in 1936 as the director of the support office in Breslau. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Glenn J Posted 24 February Share Posted 24 February 21 hours ago, stevenbecker said: Christoph (or see Kümmerling) Wachtmeister Offiziersstellvertreter Steve, not sure we are going to get far with this one. Awards of the Liakat medal were not published in the Marine-Verordnungsblatt nor were appointments to the position of an Offizierstellvertreter. WIll keep an eye out for him but will probably need to stumble across some document with his name on it. Regards Glenn Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
stevenbecker Posted 24 February Author Share Posted 24 February Cheers, Yes Christoph had me also, strange enteries for both men in Wolf? Todays Conn Bruno Kor-Kapt (LtCol) Marine Commander of the Thassos class destroyers (CoCommander Ottoman Destroyer "Tasoz" with Tevfik Halit Bey - Yarbay Conn 1914-1916 Çanakkale'deki Alman Deniz Birlikleri Komutani (German Marines Commander in Canakkale) Intelligence Staff of the German commander & Commander of the German Naval Forces in Canakkale German marine Corps in Çanakkale Commander 1914-16 awarded Ottoman Silver Liakat Medal 12-10-15 and EK I 3-16 (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Conrad Alfred Lt Straits Command Canakkale (Sonderkommando Usedom) 1915-17 return Sonderkommando 1915-17 1918- RTG 1917 return 1918 (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Cummerow Capt / Hptm shown Inspector of the Etappe (LofC) for 6th Army - 6th Orduda Menzil Müfettisi (Range Inspector in the 6th Army) Mesopotamia 1915-16 Mesopotamia (not identified) shown in Klaus Wolf's Book Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Create an account or sign in to comment
You need to be a member in order to leave a comment
Create an account
Sign up for a new account in our community. It's easy!
Register a new accountSign in
Already have an account? Sign in here.
Sign In Now